Accounts and annual returns SANDFORD PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1027626
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On Time