QURANIC ARABIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The teaching of courses with DVDs on Qur'anic Arabic are benefiting adults male and female in Birmingham but thousands of people internationally on satellite TV. The QAF project on Bayt al-Qur'an, the House of Wisdom and Peace, the first of its kind in the West. It will attract scholars from the world over, who will be benefiting from a large number of Arabic manuscripts in Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 1993: Standard registration
- QAF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROON RASHID | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
TARIQ SURTY | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MASAYOOD KHAN | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MUSHTAQ KHAN | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ASIM HAFEEZ | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ABDUL HAFEEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SALIM MAHMOOD MOOLLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr AHMED SULIMAN MOOSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr FARHAT HAFEEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR AFTAB AHMED GHARDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.77k | £50.32k | £35.82k | £56.79k | £26.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.43k | £26.23k | £26.70k | £28.19k | £28.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR TO DEVELOP AND PROMOTE THE TEACHING OF QURANIC ARABIC AND COMPREHENSION OF THE QURAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quranic Arabic Foundation
552b Coventry Road
Small Heath
Birmingham
B10 0UN
- Phone:
- 01217711894
- Email:
- qaf@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window