FRIENDS OF THE PRUDENCE SKYNNER FAMILY THERAPY CLINIC AND TRAINING COURSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual Family Therapy conference . Supply educational and training equipment e.g books , journals . DVDs etc in order to train Family Therapists to work with the population of London Borough of Wandsorth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathy Taylor | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PRAKASH PARIKH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART DELVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90 | £797 | £3.40k | £3.05k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24k | £583 | £1.32k | £1.83k | £917 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED BY THE SUPPORT OF THERAPEUTIC AND TRAINING FACILITIES PROVIDED AT THE PRUDENCE SKYNNER FAMILY THERAPY CLINIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPRINGFIELD HOSPITAL
61 GLENBURNIE ROAD
LONDON
SW17 7DJ
- Phone:
- 02035136195
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window