13TH LANCASTER SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with young people from 4-19 years old. Providing activities both inside and outside with volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Patricia Griffin | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Adey | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rubi Maybeth Garcia Almada | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bradshaw | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Armstrong | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Simon Hester | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Harling | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2000 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN GREENE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | £20.33k | £11.37k | £22.39k | £20.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.08k | £5.13k | £14.88k | £25.39k | £18.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Jefferson Close
Lancaster
LA1 5EZ
- Phone:
- 07713883740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window