UK Bangladesh Education Trust (UKBET)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working to end child labour in Bangladesh. We deliver education and support to children forced into domestic and hazardous child labour with a view to getting them back into education or vocational training. We also provide teacher training courses for secondary school English teachers and professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
- Education for Change (Previous name)
- Education for Change (Previous name)
- UK BANGLADESH EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNETTE RUTH ZERA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Redwan Ahmed | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ranu Miah | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Shahanaz Hussain | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JOANNE DUDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.86k | £24.28k | £71.26k | £96.67k | £68.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.78k | £17.73k | £52.63k | £101.76k | £58.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1993 as amended on 09 Dec 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2021 as amended on 23 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH A SERIES OF EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGES BETWEEN THIS COUNTRY AND COMMUNITIES IN BANGLADESH.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND SYLHET DISTRICT OF BANGL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 HIGHBURY TERRACE MEWS
LONDON
N5 1UT
- Phone:
- 0795 177 1466
- Email:
- info@ukbet-bd.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window