Governing document BAKEWELL AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 1958,23 JANUARY 1959,29 JANUARY 1960,29 OCTOBER 1971,31 JANUARY 1975,29 FEBRUARY 1980 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF BAKEWELL THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND THE NATION AT LARGE THE OLD HOUSE AND FOLK MUSEUM BAKEWELL WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING HISTORY AND MATTERS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
BAKEWELL, THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.