WREN PARK PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027734
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RAISING FUNDS ON BEHALF OF WREN PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT FOR THE CHILDREN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £721
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WREN PARK PARENT & TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jo Fogerty Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
HEATHER PLANT Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ALEXANDER BUCKLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £10.16k £10.95k £5.96k £0 £721
Total expenditure £9.79k £5.57k £2.92k £2.62k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 May 2021 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WREN PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
JACKSON AVENUE
MICKLEOVER
DERBY
DE3 9AY
Phone:
01332512732