Financial history ROSSENDALE PHAB CLUB

Charity number: 1027751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023 01/11/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £1.05k £7.20k £4.89k £5.23k
Total expenditure £1.65k £708 £4.22k £3.99k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A