ROLLESTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £77,520 from 12 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 09 November 1993: Standard registration
- ROLLESTON PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Swinburne | Chair | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Scott | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ings-Hibbert | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Ritchie | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dovile Sprinceana | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Hughes | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.84k | £102.84k | £98.55k | £115.06k | £101.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.73k | £98.73k | £74.55k | £91.29k | £122.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £69.10k | £68.50k | £80.80k | £77.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL LANE
ROLLESTON-ON-DOVE
BURTON-ON-TRENT
STAFFORDSHIRE
DE13 9AQ
- Phone:
- 01283247523
- Website:
-
rollestonpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window