Accounts and annual returns BLANDFORD OPPORTUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1027771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 September 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 23 September 2024 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 March 2024 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 March 2024 263 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 July 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 July 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window