Accounts and annual returns ENSTONE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027774
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On Time