CECIL M YUILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Sponsoring Chair in the field of Construction at Teesside University. b) making cash awards to students for their application and excellence of achievement. c) Other awards within the objects of the Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Northumberland
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Jean Painter | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jayne Holmes | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Caroline Yuill | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD RICHARD THOMAS YUILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £5.48k | £5.57k | £6.09k | £7.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.36k | £13.06k | £13.71k | £13.87k | £14.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO SPONSOR AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEESIDE A CHAIR TO BE OCCUPIED BY A SUITABLY QUALIFIED SENIOR ACADEMIC IN THE FIELD OF CONSTRUCTION TO PROVIDE CASH AWARDS TO STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 OF THE TRUST DEED 14/9/93.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hub 1 The Innovation Centre
Venture Court
Queens Meadow Business Park
HARTLEPOOL
TS25 5TG
- Phone:
- 01429864220
- Email:
- julierigali@yuillgroup.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window