Accounts and annual returns ASTHAN BABE KE TRUST

Charity Number: 1027792
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 July 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 July 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window