Financial history FRIENDS OF MEATH GREEN JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.86k £1.13k £10.96k £11.53k £18.91k
Total expenditure £373 £327 £3.32k £4.01k £20.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A