Turning Tides Homelessness

Charity number: 1027832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty by the provision of emergency and other accommodation, advice and assistance for persons who are deemed homeless and/or in need of such accommodation, advice or assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1993: Standard registration
  • 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1000296 RAVENSCOURT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WCHP (Working name)
  • WORTHING CHURCHES HOMELESS PROJECTS (Working name)
  • WORTHING CHURCHES HOMELESS PROJECTS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Kavan Trustee 17 February 2025
None on record
Jonathan Rosser Trustee 13 May 2024
Age UK West Sussex, Brighton & Hove
Received: On time
Daniel Keech Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Nicholas Beverley-Hedger Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Bill Jones Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
DUNCAN ANDERSON Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Martin Quinn Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Ian Mintram Trustee 09 November 2015
None on record
RICHENDA MARGARET KULLAR Trustee 13 July 2015
ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.14m £6.05m £5.63m £5.97m £7.13m
Total expenditure £3.96m £4.84m £5.67m £6.08m £7.03m
Income from government contracts £948.24k £1.09m £1.47m £1.76m £1.76m
Income from government grants N/A £166.53k £24.97k £107.42k £107.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £274.54k £558.88k £696.86k £556.37k £487.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.86m £5.49m £4.93m £5.41m £6.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.21k £906 £1.57k £3.50k £15.55k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £8.00k £10.04k £63.74k £126.25k £3.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.96m £4.84m £5.67m £6.08m £7.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.14k £12.01k £69.12k £60.89k £86.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £4.76m £5.51m £5.18m £5.44m £5.21m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.28m £1.71m £2.30m £1.89m £2.15m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £371.87k £347.38k £640.89k £611.16k £546.98k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Turning Tides
Town Hall
Chapel Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN11 1HA
Phone:
01903680740