LI TIM OI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Li Tim Oi Foundation provides grants for Anglican women in the two-thirds world to train for Christian work in their own countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Angola
- Brazil
- Burundi
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Nam | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Marshall | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|||||
TARIRO JULIAN MATSVERU | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Basa Namurye | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Professor Martyn William Percy | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.93k | £31.50k | £36.35k | £30.09k | £57.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.81k | £102.18k | £197.27k | £170.54k | £234.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 OCT 1993 as amended on 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN ENGAGED IN THEOLOGICAL STUDIES OR WORK WITHIN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION (2) CARRYING OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MINISTRY OF WOMEN WITHIN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flint House
The Street
Selmeston
POLEGATE
East Sussex
BN26 6UD
- Phone:
- 01323819313
- Email:
- ADMIN@LTOF.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window