ROTARY CLUB OF CROYDON BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to Croydon based charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
barbara harker | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
patricia painting | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
chris dighton | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN COATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £9.43k | £9.66k | £4.79k | £2.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.40k | £13.64k | £12.91k | £5.58k | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY CAPITAL AND INCOME TO OR FOR THE RELEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 SANDILANDS
CROYDON
CR0 5DB
- Phone:
- 02086621268
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window