BROCKHAMPTON PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing space for local leisure and interest pursuits, and providing functions for the use of village residents and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 02 November 1993: Standard registration
- BROCKHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Carlo Mills | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Garnett | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Owen Rhys Pembery | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hollis | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Anne Wood | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47k | £20.79k | £26.50k | £22.05k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £7.35k | £38.93k | £36.46k | £11.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.34k | £23.67k | £16.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AND CONVEYANCE DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROCKHAMPTON WITH MUCH FAWLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREYSTONES
FAWLEY
HEREFORD
HR1 4SP
- Phone:
- 01989740265
- Email:
- geoffevans82@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window