Financial history WELDON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £66.19k £70.94k £56.64k £78.70k £70.12k
Total expenditure £60.23k £65.48k £67.33k £77.08k £69.51k
Income from government contracts £46.25k £52.55k N/A £53.87k £40.47k
Income from government grants £4.45k N/A N/A £2.00k £7.00k