THE SCOTT TRUST FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation has four strands: 1. Charitable fund which supports projects associated with independent journalism, journalist ethics, media literacy and journalist training. 2. Bursaries for post graduate training in either newspaper/online journalism, broadcast journalism or software development. 3. The Guardian Foundation, the overseas training arm. 4. Education Centre, Archive & Exhibitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 1993: Standard registration
- 23 February 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1153865 THE GUARDIAN FOUNDATION
- THE GUARDIAN FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.00k | £380.00k | £270.00k | £40.41k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.65k | £366.19k | £281.93k | £93.87k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 06 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 06 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 01 August 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 10TH MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 9TH MAY 2005 AND BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 9 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window