GOODACRE AND TURNER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting All Saints Church of England Primary School, Sapcote, Leicestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Harvey | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fay Taylor | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Claire Curtis | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Hover | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Jayne Piercy | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £10.19k | £10.92k | £8.22k | £11.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.98k | £12.98k | £184 | £4.89k | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE PUPILS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL WHICH ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE SAID SCHOOL: PROVIDED THAT SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FROM SOME OTHER SOURCE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE SCHEME DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1993)
Area of benefit
SAPCOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
4 SHARNFORD ROAD
SAPCOTE
LEICESTER
LE9 4JN
- Phone:
- 07796413883
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window