Trustees ST JAMES IN MINSTER PARISH HALL CHARITY
Charity Number: 1027911
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL PARSONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Schultz | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Iles | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Long | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fred Hockin | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Edwards | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Lyle | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Marie Kent | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pamela Viner | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dorothy Christie | Trustee | 31 August 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.