Accounts and annual returns ALDWINCLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window