Financial history ALDWINCLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £61.31k £92.00k £60.00k £82.71k £109.02k
Total expenditure £75.33k £83.00k £60.00k £80.98k £96.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £39.15k £5.87k £44.00k £52.41k £104.23k