Accounts and annual returns PAVILION CHILDREN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1027939
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2004 21 December 2004 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 21 December 2004 21 days late