Accounts and annual returns WORLINGHAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027941
Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2024 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2024 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window