Trustees ST WILFRID'S PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1027964

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Wild | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Bell | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikita Carr | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan LLoyd | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jervis | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Proctor | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jobling | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Cragg | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Priestley | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.