Financial history Catcott School PTA

Charity number: 1027995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.90k £1.94k £4.68k £2.92k £3.05k
Total expenditure £11.10k £2.51k £2.37k £1.52k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A