Catcott School PTA

Charity number: 1027995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Events and fundraising for Catcott Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £3,053
Total expenditure: £8,276

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CATCOTT PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF CATCOTT SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachael Armstrong Chair 12 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.90k £1.94k £4.68k £2.92k £3.05k
Total expenditure £11.10k £2.51k £2.37k £1.52k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Middle Road
Cossington
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA7 8LH
Phone:
01278722986
Website:

No information available