EAST HERTS AND HARLOW GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides training and education in driving techniques to the standard of the institute of advanced driving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 November 1993: Standard registration
- 22 December 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 December 2015: Funds transferred to 1049210 HOME COUNTIES NORTH ADVANCED DRIVERS GROUP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £972 | £1.41k | £1.13k | £1.38k | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £680 | £776 | £1.17k | £1.11k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 21 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 05 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 16 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE EAST HERTFORDSHIRE AND WEST ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window