HOLSWORTHY GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 1028035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holsworthy Girl Guides provides a range of activities and and opportunities for girls to meet, have fun, learn and share new skills, go on holidays and trips, try new things and make friends.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £100
Total expenditure: £232

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Woodhams Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Laura Menzies Trustee 17 June 2021
THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOUTH-WEST ENGLAND
Received: On time
Diane Westaway Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200 £0 £874 £2.04k £100
Total expenditure £69 £70 £550 £1.89k £232
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Town Farm
Sutcombe
HOLSWORTHY
Devon
EX22 7PR
Phone:
07968334991
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available