CAREERS SPRINGBOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This association provides, along Christian principles, support, advice and assistance to persons irrespective of their background or beliefs around South Buckinghamshire, who are out of work or unemployed for redundancy or any other reason, and to their families and dependents. Offering a self-help group, members create mutual support with coaching in job search techniques at Monday meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Oxfordshire
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rory Cameron McCulloch FISHER | Chair | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marie WHITE | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIOT POPE | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY LOW | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EDWARDS LAMBERT | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RALPH DOUGLAS BAKER | Trustee | 05 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS JOHN PERRONET THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.41k | £2.68k | £1.39k | £3.22k | £3.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £3.06k | £2.00k | £3.19k | £3.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 2000, 25 JULY 2000 AND 2 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE PERSONS PRIMARILY WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND MIDDLESEX BUT ALSO ON A NATIONAL BASIS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, WHO HAVE BEEN MADE REDUNDANT OR WHO ARE OUT OF WORK OR UNEMPLOYED FOR ANY REASON IRRESPECTIVE OF POLITICAL AMBITION, RELIGIOUS OPINION OR FOLLOWING, RACE OR COLOUR AND TO THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN HOLLY
BACK LANE
CHALFONT ST. GILES
HP8 4PB
- Phone:
- 01494875151
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window