Accounts and annual returns ST CHADS PLAYGROUP (NEWCASTLE)

Charity number: 1028052
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 February 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 October 2016 On Time