Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF REDLANDS

Charity Number: 1028054
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 August 2020 27 October 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 09 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required