SANTA ROSA FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
supporting educational activities in Managua and the Consiguina peninsula, Nicaragua
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Nicaragua
Governance
- 05 November 1993: Standard registration
- 25 August 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1106881 NICARAGUA SOLIDARITY CAMPAIGN LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.14k | £9.96k | £10.70k | £11.36k | £9.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £9.89k | £9.31k | £12.13k | £9.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 05 March 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 25 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN NICARAGUA, IN PARTICULAR IN THE BARRIO SANTA ROSA OF MANAGUA
Area of benefit
NICARAGUA IN PARTICULAR THE BARRIO SANTA ROSA OF MANAGUA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window