BURNHAM MARKET NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ofsted registered pre-school Nursery offering a flexible service Mon-Fri, academic term time, 9.00am to 3.00pm. Places are available for 2 to 4 year olds and the setting is eligible for governement funding for 2 year olds and 3 & 4 year olds (subject to conditions).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £32,598 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 November 1993: Standard registration
- BURNHAM MARKET NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- BURNHAM MARKET PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Billing | Chair | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Margaret Thompson | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alana Jasmine Edge | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Newstead | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Rutland | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Ellen Rose Barker | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Warren | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Clark | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.77k | £50.50k | £39.35k | £52.53k | £40.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.53k | £53.30k | £46.61k | £50.36k | £43.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £28.90k | N/A | £32.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnham Market Primary School
Friars Lane
Burnham Norton
KING'S LYNN
PE31 8JA
- Phone:
- 07985905178
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window