Accounts and annual returns WOOTTON BASSETT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028205
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 15 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 21 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required