FAMILY FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Friends' objectives are the relief of children and parents in despair and distress and the prevention of emotional and physical abuse of such children. The aims of the charity are to give long-term practical and emotional support to parents and children in need through trained volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,750 from 1 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Lynn Hearn | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sandler | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allison Blasch | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Smith | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MADEL | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.26k | £222.10k | £236.14k | £290.96k | £294.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.91k | £208.46k | £238.43k | £261.72k | £307.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £37.50k | £37.50k | £37.50k | £37.50k | £39.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.25k | £6.00k | £3.50k | £7.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN OR PARENTS IN DESPAIR AND DISTRESS AND THE PREVENTION OF EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL ABUSE OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
10 Acklam Road
LONDON
W10 5QZ
- Phone:
- 02089609099
- Email:
- info@familyfriends.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window