Financial history CLIFFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1028230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.49k £21.23k £6.67k £6.39k £6.47k
Total expenditure £10.42k £8.68k £10.62k £8.25k £8.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.90k N/A N/A N/A