ROTARY CLUB OF TAVISTOCK CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collections in Tavistock at Christmas, at Goose Fair annually, most years a Golf tournament at Tavistock Golf Club in May. The Shelterbox Trust is supported, there is an annual dinner for senior citizens,supporting dementia campaign,organising "Youth Speaks" for local schools etc, help afforded when possible to local good causes and overseas disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Walter Stephen Lake | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Elizabeth Ellis | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Richard Ellis | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Guy Talbot | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £12.54k | £12.90k | £9.90k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.62k | £11.52k | £13.80k | £10.07k | £8.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Chillaton
LIFTON
PL16 0HS
- Phone:
- 01822860314
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window