Trustees SOUTH FARNHAM SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yasmin Riffi Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Leslie Andrew Bishop Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Esther Franks Trustee 23 February 2022
SOUTH FARNHAM SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Jodie Chambers Trustee 21 January 2020
None on record
Alexandra Chester Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record