PROVINCIAL GRAND CHARITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND HUNTINGDONSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO, OR FOR THE RELIEF OF: 1) NEED AMONGST BROTHER MASONS, OR THEIR WIDOWS, OR OTHER RELATIVES OR DEPENDENTS; 2) TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MASONIC CHARITIES 3) TO OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR SOCIETIES, OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Thomas Smith | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Gary Foreman | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Edward Margot | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Leonard Warman | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Warren Brice | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dale Robert Gilbert | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Joseph Almond | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Rhydderch Williams | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Warren | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Sparks | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.16k | £203.47k | £59.54k | £88.77k | £130.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.40k | £142.20k | £108.48k | £76.03k | £127.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR WIDOWS AND OTHER RELATIVES OR DEPENDENTS AND SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS SOCIETY OR SOCIETIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empery
Rockingham Paddocks
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN16 9JR
- Phone:
- 01536 511156
- Email:
- dockevw@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window