CENTRAL CHELTENHAM WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1028338
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2004

Total income: £4,222
Total expenditure: £4,454

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1993: Standard registration
  • 28 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • CENTRAL CHELTENHAM WOMENS INSTITUE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004
Total gross income £4.22k
Total expenditure £4.45k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2004 30 September 2005 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required