NESTON EVENING WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide women with the chance to develop their confidence, skills and awareness of their role as a emancipated citizens. We also benefit local community efforts where we can.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Esain | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bowater | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bushell | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fisher | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Osburn | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Truelove | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mills | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £1.59k | £813 | £1.21k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.87k | £867 | £1.06k | £1.16k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ALREADY LODGED
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILTSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS
INSTITUTES
W I HOUSE
17 COUCH LANE
DEVIZES
SN10 1EB
- Phone:
- 01380739340
- Email:
- fedsec@wiltshirewi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window