HEALEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1028356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Summer leavers BBQ Christmas disco Halloween & Valentines party Rag Bag Cake Bake

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £64
Total expenditure: £1,429

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Rochdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEALEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASS (Working name)
  • HEALEY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Hopkins Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Wendy Robinson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
JANE COONEY Trustee 11 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £37.77k £1.59k £249 £1.56k £64
Total expenditure £2.91k £110 £1.63k £4.01k £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 July 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2021 364 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O THE TREASURER
EARNSHAW AVENUE
ROCHDALE
LANCASHIRE
OL12 0ST
Phone:
01706522770