Financial history POTLEY HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.52k £431 £5.63k £4.85k £3.00k
Total expenditure £7.55k £261 £8.21k £2.86k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A