SOLENT U3A TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational lectures and visits. Study groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 November 1993: Standard registration
- SOLENT U 3 A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Lorraine Lee | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Veck | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances MacEnri | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Gilhooley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marshall | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Jean Ann Smith | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Maureen Anne Brown | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KAVANAGH | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD RYAN | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN RYAN | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JACKSON | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.47k | £2.25k | £4.37k | £3.55k | £16.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £3.95k | £3.83k | £3.66k | £14.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
FAREHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Green Walk
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO15 6AZ
- Phone:
- 01329310607
- Email:
- secretary@solentu3a.org.uk
- Website:
-
u3asites.org.uk/solent
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window