TYTHERINGTON WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1028471
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Total income: £5,638
Total expenditure: £4,099
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
- 11 May 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.98k | £3.74k | £3.88k | £3.71k | £5.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £2.98k | £4.01k | £3.06k | £4.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 27 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 15 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ALREADY LODGED
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window