Accounts and annual returns MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE TRUST

Charity Number: 1028507
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 11 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 24 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 13 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 26 October 2011 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 26 October 2011 88 days late