MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a historical and social museum of Kent life, which shall be open to the public at all reasonable times and do all such things as may be necessary or expedient or ancillary for or in connection with its provision, enhancement or maintenance including the providing of ancillary recreational and educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
- 22 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COBTREE (Working name)
- MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.34k | £105.34k | £7.74k | £6.77k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.66k | £78.66k | £990 | £2.29k | £361 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 11 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 24 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 13 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 26 October 2011 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 26 October 2011 | 88 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE ALL FORMS OF EDUCATION IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND ELSEWHERE AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE AN HISTORIC ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE AND ANY OTHER MUSEUMS GALLERIES AND LIBRARIES AND OTHER PLACES WHERE SUCH PURPOSES MAY BY ACHIEVED. 2) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OR ACTIVITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window